Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States House of Representatives Election Recount Act of 1986

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill providing for time limits for completion of recounts in general and special elections for the office of Representative.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/05/1986Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/11/1986Referred to Subcommittee on Elections.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
06/05/1986Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/1986Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/05/1986
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 06/05/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 06/05/1986
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 06/10/1986
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/10/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 06/10/1986
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/10/1986
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/10/1986
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 06/10/1986
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/10/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 06/11/1986
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/11/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/11/1986
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/17/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 06/17/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 06/17/1986
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 06/24/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 07/23/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 07/23/1986
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 07/23/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 07/23/1986
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/23/1986
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/11/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 09/11/1986
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 09/19/1986
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/19/1986
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 09/22/1986
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 09/22/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 09/22/1986
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/23/1986
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 09/23/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 09/30/1986
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 09/30/1986
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 10/01/1986
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 10/01/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/08/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/08/1986

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration06/05/1986 Referred to
House Administration Subcommittee on Elections06/11/1986 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4953.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4953. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/05/1986)

United States House of Representatives Election Recount Act of 1986 - Declares that any recount of ballots for the office of Representative shall be completed: (1) in a general election by December 31 of the year of the election; and (2) in a special election by the end of six weeks after the election.