Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 06/11/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 06/11/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 06/11/1986
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/17/1986
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/17/1986
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 06/17/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/25/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/25/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/25/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 06/26/1986
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 07/15/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/15/1986
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 07/15/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/15/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 07/15/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/22/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 07/22/1986
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 07/22/1986
Rep. Franklin, William W. [R-MS-2] 07/22/1986
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 07/22/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 07/29/1986
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 07/29/1986
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 07/29/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/29/1986
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/31/1986
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/1986
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 07/31/1986
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 07/31/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 08/05/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 08/05/1986
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 08/05/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 08/05/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 08/12/1986
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 08/12/1986
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 08/12/1986
Rep. Moore, W. Henson [R-LA-6] 09/10/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/10/1986
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 09/10/1986
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/10/1986
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 09/10/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/10/1986
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 10/17/1986