Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rostenkowski, Dan [D-IL-8]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 06/18/1986
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 06/18/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 06/18/1986
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 06/18/1986
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 06/18/1986
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 06/18/1986
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/19/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 06/19/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/19/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/19/1986
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/19/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 06/19/1986
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 06/19/1986
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/24/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/24/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 06/24/1986
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 06/24/1986
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/24/1986
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 06/24/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/26/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/26/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/26/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/26/1986
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 07/15/1986
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 07/15/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/15/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/15/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 07/15/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/15/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 07/15/1986
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 07/15/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/15/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 07/16/1986