Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 07/29/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 08/05/1986
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 08/05/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/05/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 08/12/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 08/12/1986
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 08/12/1986
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 08/12/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 08/12/1986
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 08/12/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 08/15/1986
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 08/15/1986
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 09/09/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/09/1986
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 09/09/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 09/09/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/09/1986
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/09/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 09/09/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 09/12/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/12/1986
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 09/12/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 09/12/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/12/1986
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/12/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 09/12/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 09/17/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 09/17/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 09/17/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 09/17/1986
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/17/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 09/17/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/17/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/17/1986
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 09/17/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/18/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/24/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 09/24/1986