Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Evans, Cooper [R-IA-3]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 08/06/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/11/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/11/1986
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 08/11/1986
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 08/11/1986
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 09/10/1986
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 09/10/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/10/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 09/10/1986
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 09/10/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 09/10/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 09/16/1986
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/16/1986
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 09/16/1986
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/24/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 09/24/1986
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 09/24/1986
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 09/24/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/24/1986
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 09/24/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 09/24/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 09/24/1986
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 09/24/1986
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 09/24/1986
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 09/24/1986
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 09/24/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 09/24/1986
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3] 09/24/1986
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/24/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 09/29/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 09/29/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/29/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/29/1986
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 09/29/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/29/1986
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 09/29/1986
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 09/29/1986
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/29/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 09/29/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 09/29/1986
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/29/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/30/1986
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 09/30/1986
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/30/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/30/1986
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/30/1986
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 10/02/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/02/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/02/1986
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 10/08/1986
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 10/08/1986
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 10/08/1986
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/08/1986
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3] 10/17/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 10/17/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 10/17/1986
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/17/1986
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/17/1986