Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 08/13/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 08/13/1986
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 08/13/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 08/14/1986
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 08/14/1986
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 09/18/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/18/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/18/1986
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 09/18/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/23/1986
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 09/23/1986
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 09/26/1986