Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snyder, M. G. (Gene) [R-KY-4]* 09/09/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 09/09/1986
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 09/09/1986
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 09/09/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 09/09/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 09/09/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/09/1986
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 09/09/1986
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 09/10/1986
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 09/11/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/11/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/22/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 09/22/1986
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 09/23/1986
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/24/1986