Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 09/10/1986
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Franklin, William W. [R-MS-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21]* 09/10/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 09/10/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 09/10/1986
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 09/10/1986
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 09/10/1986
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/12/1986
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/12/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/12/1986
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 09/12/1986
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 09/12/1986
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/12/1986
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 09/12/1986
Rep. Moore, W. Henson [R-LA-6] 09/12/1986
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 09/12/1986
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 09/12/1986
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/12/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/12/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 09/12/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/16/1986
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 09/16/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 09/16/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/16/1986
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 09/16/1986
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 09/16/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/16/1986
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 09/18/1986
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/18/1986
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 09/18/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/18/1986
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/18/1986
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 09/18/1986
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 09/25/1986
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 09/25/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/25/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 09/25/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 09/25/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 10/01/1986
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3] 10/01/1986
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 10/02/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 10/09/1986