Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 09/25/1986
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 09/25/1986
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 09/25/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 09/25/1986
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 09/29/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/29/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/29/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/29/1986
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/29/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 09/29/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 09/29/1986
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 09/29/1986
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/29/1986
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/29/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/29/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 09/29/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/29/1986
Rep. Waldon, Alton R., Jr. [D-NY-6] 09/29/1986
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/29/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/29/1986
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 09/29/1986
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/01/1986
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 10/01/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/01/1986
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/01/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 10/01/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 10/01/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 10/01/1986
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 10/01/1986
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 10/01/1986
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 10/01/1986
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 10/01/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 10/01/1986
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/01/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/01/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/01/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/01/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 10/01/1986
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 10/01/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 10/07/1986
Rep. Franklin, William W. [R-MS-2] 10/07/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 10/07/1986
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 10/07/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 10/07/1986
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 10/07/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/07/1986
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 10/07/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/15/1986
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 10/15/1986
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 10/15/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/15/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/15/1986
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 10/15/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/15/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 10/15/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 10/15/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 10/15/1986
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/15/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 10/15/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 10/15/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 10/15/1986
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/15/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 10/15/1986
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 10/15/1986
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 10/15/1986
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 10/15/1986
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 10/15/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 10/15/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/15/1986
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 10/15/1986
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 10/15/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 10/15/1986
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 10/15/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 10/15/1986
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 10/15/1986
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 10/15/1986
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 10/15/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 10/16/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/16/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 10/16/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 10/16/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 10/16/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 10/16/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 10/16/1986
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 10/17/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 10/17/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/17/1986
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 10/17/1986