Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 02/28/1985
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 02/28/1985
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1]* 02/28/1985
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 02/28/1985
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 02/28/1985
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 04/02/1985
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/02/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/02/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/02/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/02/1985
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/02/1985
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/02/1985
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 04/04/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 04/04/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 05/08/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/08/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/08/1985
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/15/1985
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 05/22/1985