Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 02/06/1985
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 02/06/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/06/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/06/1985
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 02/07/1985
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/07/1985
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 02/19/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 02/26/1985
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/19/1985
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 04/02/1985
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 04/16/1985
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 06/04/1985
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 06/11/1985
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/11/1985
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/11/1985
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 06/11/1985
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 06/11/1985
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/11/1985
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/11/1985
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 06/12/1985
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 06/12/1985
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/12/1985
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/18/1985
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/18/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/18/1985
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/18/1985
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/18/1985
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/20/1985
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/20/1985
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/20/1985
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/20/1985
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 06/20/1985
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 06/25/1985
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 06/25/1985
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 06/25/1985
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 06/25/1985
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/25/1985
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/25/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 06/25/1985
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 06/26/1985
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/1985
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/26/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/09/1985
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 07/09/1985
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/09/1985
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/09/1985
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/09/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/30/1985
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 07/30/1985
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 11/14/1985
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/04/1986
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 06/04/1986
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 06/10/1986
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/16/1986
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/16/1986
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 06/16/1986
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/17/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/18/1986
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/18/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/25/1986
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/15/1986