Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

New GI Bill Amendments of 1985

Short Titles as Reported to House

New GI Bill Amendments of 1985

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Educational Assistance Eligibility Amendments of 1985

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

New GI Bill Amendments of 1985

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to ensure an orderly transition to the new educational assistance program established by chapter 30 of that title.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
08/01/1985Committee on Armed Services. Reported to Senate by Senator Goldwater unfavorably without amendment. With written report No. 99-124.
06/27/1985Committee on Veterans. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 99-96.
03/25/1985Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
03/20/1985Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Armed Services. Report No: 99-17 (Part II).
03/07/1985Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 99-17 (Part I).
01/28/1985Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
08/01/1985SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 272.
08/01/1985SenateCommittee on Armed Services. Reported to Senate by Senator Goldwater unfavorably without amendment. With written report No. 99-124.
07/25/1985SenateCommittee on Armed Services. Ordered to be reported without amendment unfavorably.
06/27/1985SenateReferred to the Committee on Armed Services by unanimous consent for a period not to exceed 45 days.
06/27/1985SenateCommittee on Veterans. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 99-96.
04/18/1985SenateCommittee on Veterans. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/28/1985SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
03/25/1985HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
03/25/1985HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
03/20/1985HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 12.
03/20/1985HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Armed Services. Report No: 99-17 (Part II).
03/20/1985HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
03/19/1985HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation
03/19/1985HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation
03/07/1985HouseReported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 99-17 (Part I).
03/06/1985HouseOrdered to be Reported.
03/06/1985HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/01/1985HouseExecutive Comment Received From DOD.
02/12/1985HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/12/1985HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD.
01/29/1985HouseExecutive Comment Received From DOD.
01/29/1985HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD.
01/28/1985HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
01/28/1985HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
01/28/1985HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services01/28/1985 Referred to
03/20/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-17 Part 2
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation02/12/1985 Referred to
03/19/1985 Markup by
03/19/1985 Reported by
House Veterans' Affairs01/28/1985 Referred to
03/06/1985 Markup by
03/07/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-17 Part 1
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/28/1985 Referred to
04/18/1985 Markup by
06/27/1985 Reported by S.Rept 99-96
Senate Armed Services06/27/1985 Referred to
07/25/1985 Markup by
08/01/1985 Reported by S.Rept 99-124

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.752. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (06/27/1985)

(Reported to Senate from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 99-96)

New GI Bill Amendments of 1985 - Amends the Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 1984, Title VII of the FY 1985 Department of Defense Authorization Act (Public Law 98-525), to change the initial-entry eligibility date for entitlement to basic veterans' educational assistance from July 1, 1985, to the date of enactment of this Act.

Entitles to basic educational assistance those individuals who have previously served on active duty, have left the service for a period of 90 days or more, and reenter the service for a specified period of time.

Changes the initial-entry eligibility date for entitlement to such educational assistance for members of the Selected Reserve from July 1, 1985, to the date of enactment of this Act. Entitles such Reserve members to such assistance if they have previously served on active duty, have left the service for a period of 90 days or more, and reenter the service for a certain period of active-duty and of reserve service. Changes the entry eligibility date required for an individual to receive educational assistance for inservice enrollment in a program of education.

Changes the time period during which individuals on active duty in the armed forces are prohibited from initial enrollment into the veterans' educational assistance program to the period between January 1, 1986, and June 30, 1988.

Changes from July 1, 1985, to the date of enactment of this Act the eligibility date for educational assistance for members of the Selected Reserve who enlist, reenlist, or extend their service in the Reserve for a period of at least six years.