Committees: H.R.752 — 99th Congress (1985-1986)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services01/28/1985 Referred to
03/20/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-17 Part 2
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation02/12/1985 Referred to
03/19/1985 Markup by
03/19/1985 Reported by
House Veterans' Affairs01/28/1985 Referred to
03/06/1985 Markup by
03/07/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-17 Part 1
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/28/1985 Referred to
04/18/1985 Markup by
06/27/1985 Reported by S.Rept 99-96
Senate Armed Services06/27/1985 Referred to
07/25/1985 Markup by
08/01/1985 Reported by S.Rept 99-124