Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 01/30/1985
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 01/30/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/03/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 04/03/1985
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/03/1985
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 04/03/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/03/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 04/03/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/03/1985
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 04/03/1985
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/03/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 04/03/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/03/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 04/03/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/03/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/03/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/03/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/03/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 04/03/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/03/1985
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/03/1985
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/03/1985
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/03/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/03/1985
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/03/1985
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/03/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/03/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/03/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/03/1985
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/03/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 04/03/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/03/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/03/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/03/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/03/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 04/03/1985
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/03/1985
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 04/03/1985
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/03/1985
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/03/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/03/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/03/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 04/03/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 04/03/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 04/03/1985
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 04/03/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/03/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/03/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/03/1985
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 04/03/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/03/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/03/1985
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/03/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/03/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/03/1985
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 04/03/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 04/03/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 04/03/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 04/03/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/03/1985
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/03/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/03/1985
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/03/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/03/1985
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/03/1985
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/03/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 04/03/1985
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 04/03/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 04/03/1985
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/03/1985
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Zschau, Edwin V. W. [R-CA-12] 04/03/1985
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/22/1985
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 04/22/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 04/22/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/24/1985
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/24/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 05/07/1985
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 05/07/1985
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 05/07/1985
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 05/07/1985
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/14/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/14/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/14/1985
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/21/1985
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 05/21/1985
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 05/21/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/21/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/21/1985
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 06/06/1985
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/06/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 06/06/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/06/1985
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 06/26/1985
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/26/1985
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/09/1985
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/17/1985
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 09/17/1985
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/17/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 09/17/1985
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 09/17/1985
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 10/22/1985
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 12/10/1985
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 12/16/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 02/19/1986
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 02/19/1986
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 05/06/1986