Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to permit Employee Organizations, which are not eligible to participate in the Federal Employees Health Benefits Program solely because of the requirement that applications for approval be filed before January 1, 1980, to apply for approval to offer a health benefits plan.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/17/1985Became Public Law No: 99-53.
06/17/1985Signed by President.
06/06/1985Presented to the President.
06/03/1985Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
05/13/1985Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/09/1985Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 99-72.
01/31/1985Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
06/17/1985Became Public Law No: 99-53.
06/17/1985Signed by President.
06/06/1985HousePresented to the President.
06/05/1985SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
06/03/1985SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
05/14/1985SenateReceived in the Senate and held at the desk by unanimous consent.
05/13/1985HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/13/1985HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
05/09/1985HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 45.
05/09/1985HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 99-72.
05/08/1985HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
05/08/1985HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/07/1985HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits
05/07/1985HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits
03/14/1985HouseExecutive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM.
02/28/1985HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
01/31/1985HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
01/31/1985HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service01/31/1985 Referred to
05/08/1985 Markup by
05/09/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-72
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits02/28/1985 Referred to
05/07/1985 Markup by
05/07/1985 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.873. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/13/1985)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Authorizes the establishment of additional Federal employee health benefit plans for members of employee organizations which apply within 90 days after enactment of this Act to the Office of Personnel Management for plan approval. Sets forth the requirements for such approval.

Authorizes certain restored disability annuitants to: (1) enroll in a Federal health benefit plan if such annuitant was enrolled in any such plan prior to termination; and (2) elect to resume Federal life insurance coverage. Makes such authority applicable to any disability annuitant whose annuity is or was restored after December 31, 1983, and before the end of the 90-day period beginning on the date of enactment of this Act.