Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 02/04/1985
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 02/28/1985
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 02/28/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 02/28/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/28/1985
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 02/28/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/07/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 03/07/1985
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 03/07/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/07/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 03/07/1985
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 03/07/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/07/1985
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 03/07/1985
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/07/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/07/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/07/1985
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 03/07/1985
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 03/07/1985
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 03/07/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/07/1985
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/07/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 03/07/1985
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/07/1985
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/07/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/07/1985
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 03/07/1985
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/07/1985
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 03/07/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 03/19/1985
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 03/19/1985
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 03/19/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 03/19/1985
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 03/19/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 03/19/1985
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 03/19/1985
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 03/19/1985
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 03/19/1985
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 03/19/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/19/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 03/19/1985
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 03/19/1985
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/19/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/19/1985
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 03/19/1985
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/19/1985
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 03/19/1985
Rep. Franklin, William W. [R-MS-2] 03/19/1985
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 03/26/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 03/26/1985
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/26/1985
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/26/1985
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 03/26/1985
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/26/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/26/1985
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/26/1985
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/26/1985
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 03/26/1985
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 03/26/1985
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/26/1985
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 03/26/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/26/1985
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 03/26/1985
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/26/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/26/1985
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/26/1985
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/26/1985
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 04/02/1985
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 04/02/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/02/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 04/02/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/02/1985
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/02/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/02/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/02/1985
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/02/1985
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 04/02/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/02/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/02/1985
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 04/02/1985
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/24/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 04/24/1985
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/24/1985
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/24/1985
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/24/1985
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/24/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/24/1985
Rep. Zschau, Edwin V. W. [R-CA-12] 04/24/1985
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/24/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/24/1985
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 04/24/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 04/24/1985
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 04/24/1985
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/24/1985
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 04/24/1985
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 05/02/1985
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 05/02/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 05/02/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/02/1985
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 05/21/1985
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 05/21/1985
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 05/21/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/21/1985
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/21/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 05/21/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 05/21/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 05/21/1985
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 05/21/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/21/1985
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/21/1985
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 05/21/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/18/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 06/18/1985
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/18/1985
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/18/1985