Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 06/06/1985
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 06/06/1985
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5]* 06/06/1985
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 06/06/1985
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 12/03/1985
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 12/03/1985
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 12/03/1985
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 12/03/1985
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 12/03/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 12/03/1985
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 12/03/1985
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 12/03/1985
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 12/03/1985
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 12/03/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 12/16/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 12/16/1985
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 12/16/1985
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 12/16/1985
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/06/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 03/06/1986
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 03/06/1986
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 03/06/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 03/06/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 03/06/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/06/1986
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 03/06/1986
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/06/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/13/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/13/1986
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 05/13/1986
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 05/13/1986
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/17/1986
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/17/1986