Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 04/08/1986
Rep. Moore, W. Henson [R-LA-6]* 04/08/1986
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/30/1986
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/30/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 04/30/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/30/1986
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 04/30/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 04/30/1986
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/30/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/30/1986
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/30/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 04/30/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 04/30/1986
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/30/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/30/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 04/30/1986
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/30/1986
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/30/1986
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 04/30/1986
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 04/30/1986
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/30/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5] 04/30/1986
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 04/30/1986
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 04/30/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/30/1986
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 04/30/1986
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/30/1986
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 04/30/1986
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 04/30/1986
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 04/30/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 04/30/1986
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 04/30/1986
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 04/30/1986
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 04/30/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/30/1986
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 04/30/1986
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/30/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 04/30/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 04/30/1986
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/30/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 04/30/1986
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/30/1986
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 04/30/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 04/30/1986
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 04/30/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/30/1986
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/30/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 04/30/1986
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 04/30/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/30/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/30/1986
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 04/30/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 04/30/1986
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 04/30/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 04/30/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 04/30/1986
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Zschau, Edwin V. W. [R-CA-12] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/30/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 04/30/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/30/1986
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 04/30/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 04/30/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/30/1986
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/12/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/12/1986
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/12/1986
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 05/12/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/12/1986
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/12/1986
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/12/1986
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 05/12/1986
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/12/1986
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 05/12/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 05/12/1986
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8] 05/12/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/12/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/12/1986
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/12/1986
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/12/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 05/12/1986
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/12/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 05/12/1986
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 05/12/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/12/1986
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/12/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/12/1986
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 05/12/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/12/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/12/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/12/1986
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 05/12/1986
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 05/12/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/12/1986
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/12/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 05/12/1986
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 05/12/1986
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 05/12/1986
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 05/12/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/12/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/12/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/12/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/12/1986
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 05/12/1986
Rep. Franklin, William W. [R-MS-2] 05/12/1986
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 05/12/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 05/12/1986
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/12/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 05/12/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 05/12/1986
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4] 05/12/1986
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 05/12/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/12/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/12/1986
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 05/12/1986
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/12/1986
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14] 05/12/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 05/12/1986
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 05/12/1986
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 05/12/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/12/1986
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/12/1986
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 05/12/1986
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/12/1986
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 05/13/1986
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 05/13/1986
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/13/1986
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/13/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 05/14/1986
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 05/14/1986
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/14/1986