Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 04/21/1986
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/21/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/22/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 04/22/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/22/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/22/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/29/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 04/29/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 04/29/1986
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3] 04/29/1986
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 04/29/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 04/30/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/05/1986
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/05/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/05/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/07/1986
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/07/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/07/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 05/08/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 05/08/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/08/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 05/14/1986
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/14/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/14/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/14/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/14/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 05/15/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/21/1986
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/21/1986
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 05/21/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/04/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/04/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/04/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 06/04/1986
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 07/24/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 07/30/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/30/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 07/30/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 07/30/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/30/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 07/30/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 07/30/1986
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 07/31/1986
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 07/31/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/31/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 08/07/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 08/07/1986