Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 04/29/1986
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 05/06/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/06/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/06/1986
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/06/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/06/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/06/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/06/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 05/06/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/06/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 05/06/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/06/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/06/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/06/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 05/06/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/06/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 05/06/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/06/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/06/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/06/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 05/06/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 05/06/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/06/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/06/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/06/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/06/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/14/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/14/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 05/14/1986
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 05/14/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/14/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/14/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/14/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/19/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/21/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/22/1986
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/03/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/03/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/10/1986
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 06/11/1986
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 06/16/1986