Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 04/29/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/06/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/06/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/1986
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/06/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/06/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/06/1986
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/06/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 05/06/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 05/06/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/06/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/06/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/06/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/06/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 05/06/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/14/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/14/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/14/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/14/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/14/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/14/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/14/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/19/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/19/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/21/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/21/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/03/1986
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 06/05/1986