Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 05/06/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/21/1986
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 05/21/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/21/1986
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 05/21/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/21/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/21/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/21/1986
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/21/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/21/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 05/21/1986
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/21/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/21/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/21/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 05/21/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/21/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/21/1986
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/21/1986
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 05/21/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/21/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/21/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 05/21/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/21/1986
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 05/21/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/21/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/21/1986
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 05/21/1986
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 05/21/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 05/21/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/21/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/21/1986
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 05/21/1986
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 05/21/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/21/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 05/21/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/21/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/21/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 05/21/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/21/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 05/21/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 06/05/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/05/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/17/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 06/17/1986
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 06/17/1986
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 06/17/1986
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/17/1986
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 06/17/1986
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 06/17/1986
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/17/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/17/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/17/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/17/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/17/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/17/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/17/1986
Rep. Eckert, Fred J. [R-NY-30] 06/17/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/17/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/17/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/17/1986
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/17/1986
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/17/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/17/1986
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 06/17/1986
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 06/17/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/17/1986
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/17/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/17/1986
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 06/17/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/17/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/17/1986
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/17/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/17/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/17/1986
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 06/17/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/17/1986
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 06/17/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/26/1986
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 06/26/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 06/26/1986
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/26/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/26/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/26/1986
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 06/26/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/26/1986
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 06/26/1986
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 06/26/1986
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 06/26/1986
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/26/1986
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 06/26/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/15/1986
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/15/1986
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 07/15/1986
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 07/15/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/15/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 07/15/1986
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/15/1986
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 07/15/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/15/1986
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/15/1986
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 07/15/1986
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 07/15/1986
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 07/15/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/15/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 07/15/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/15/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 07/15/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 07/15/1986
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/15/1986
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 07/23/1986
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 07/23/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 07/23/1986
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/23/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/23/1986
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 07/23/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/23/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 08/14/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 08/14/1986
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/14/1986
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 08/14/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 08/14/1986
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 08/14/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 08/14/1986
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 08/14/1986
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 08/14/1986
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 08/14/1986
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 08/14/1986
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 08/14/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 08/14/1986
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/09/1986
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 09/09/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/09/1986
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/09/1986
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 09/09/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 09/09/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 09/09/1986
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 09/09/1986
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 09/09/1986
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 09/09/1986
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 09/09/1986
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 09/09/1986
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/09/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/09/1986
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 09/09/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/16/1986
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/16/1986
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 09/16/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/16/1986
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 09/16/1986
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 09/18/1986
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 09/18/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 09/18/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/29/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 09/29/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/29/1986