Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Evans, Cooper [R-IA-3]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 05/15/1986
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4]* 05/15/1986
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 05/22/1986
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 05/22/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/22/1986
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 05/22/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 05/22/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/09/1986
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/09/1986
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 06/09/1986
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/09/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 06/09/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/09/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/09/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 06/09/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 06/09/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/09/1986
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 06/26/1986
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21] 06/26/1986
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 06/26/1986
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 06/26/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/26/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/26/1986
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/12/1986
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 08/12/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 08/12/1986