Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/08/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 05/08/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 05/08/1986
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 05/08/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 05/08/1986
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 05/08/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/15/1986
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/15/1986
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 05/15/1986
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 05/15/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/15/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/15/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/15/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 05/15/1986
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 05/22/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/22/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/22/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/22/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/22/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/22/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/22/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 05/22/1986
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/22/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/22/1986
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 05/22/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/22/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/22/1986
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/22/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 05/22/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/22/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/22/1986
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 05/22/1986
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 05/22/1986
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 06/04/1986
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/04/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/04/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/04/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 06/04/1986
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 06/04/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 06/04/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 06/04/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 06/04/1986
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/04/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/04/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/04/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/04/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/04/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 06/04/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/04/1986
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 06/04/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/04/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 06/04/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/12/1986
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 06/12/1986
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 06/12/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/12/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 06/12/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/12/1986
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/12/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 06/12/1986
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 06/12/1986
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 06/12/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/12/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/12/1986
Rep. Snyder, M. G. (Gene) [R-KY-4] 06/12/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/12/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 06/26/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/26/1986
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/26/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 06/26/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 06/26/1986
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/26/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 06/26/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 06/26/1986
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/26/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/26/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/26/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/26/1986
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/26/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/26/1986
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 09/26/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 09/26/1986
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 09/26/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 09/26/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 09/26/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 09/26/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/26/1986
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/26/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 09/26/1986
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 09/26/1986
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 09/26/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/26/1986
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/26/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/26/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/26/1986
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 09/26/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 09/26/1986
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 09/26/1986