Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 05/14/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 05/14/1986
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 05/14/1986
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 05/21/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/21/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/21/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 05/21/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 06/05/1986
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/17/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/17/1986
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/17/1986
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/17/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/17/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 06/17/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 06/17/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/17/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/17/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 06/17/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/17/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/26/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 06/26/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/26/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/26/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/26/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 06/26/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/26/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/26/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/26/1986
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/15/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/15/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/1986
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 07/15/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/15/1986
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3] 08/14/1986