Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 07/24/1986
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 08/11/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 08/11/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 08/11/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 08/11/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/09/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 09/17/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 09/17/1986
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/17/1986
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/17/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/17/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 09/17/1986
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 09/17/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 09/18/1986
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/18/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 09/23/1986
Rep. Waldon, Alton R., Jr. [D-NY-6] 09/23/1986
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/23/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 09/23/1986
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/25/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/06/1986
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 10/06/1986