Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing the sense of the Congress with respect to builder bonds.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/20/1985Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/20/1985Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/20/1985Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3]* 03/20/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/20/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 03/20/1985
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/26/1985
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 03/26/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 03/26/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 03/28/1985
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 04/02/1985
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 04/02/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/25/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/25/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/25/1985
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/01/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 05/01/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/01/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/01/1985
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/06/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/09/1985
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/09/1985
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 05/15/1985
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 05/15/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/03/1985
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/03/1985
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/03/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/10/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 06/20/1985
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 06/20/1985
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/20/1985
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/23/1985
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/23/1985
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/23/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/23/1985
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 07/23/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 09/04/1985
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 09/04/1985
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/04/1985

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/20/1985 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.90.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.90. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/20/1985)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the provisions of the Internal Revenue Code relating to installment sales and the regulations relating to such sales should not be modified or amended in any way that will alter the manner in which mortgage-backed builder bond transactions are currently taxed.