Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 02/25/1985
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 02/25/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/04/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/04/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/04/1985
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 03/04/1985
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 03/04/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/04/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/04/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 03/04/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/04/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/04/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/04/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/04/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/04/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/04/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 03/04/1985
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 03/04/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/04/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 03/04/1985
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 03/04/1985
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 03/04/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/04/1985
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 03/04/1985
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/04/1985
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/04/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/04/1985
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/04/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 03/04/1985
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 03/04/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/04/1985
Rep. Evans, Cooper [R-IA-3] 03/04/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 03/04/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 03/04/1985
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/04/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/04/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/04/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/04/1985
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 03/04/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 03/04/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/04/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/04/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 03/04/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/04/1985
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 03/04/1985
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/04/1985
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/04/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 03/04/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/07/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/07/1985
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 03/07/1985
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 03/07/1985
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 03/07/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/07/1985
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/07/1985
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/07/1985
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/07/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/07/1985
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/07/1985
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/07/1985
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 03/07/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/07/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/07/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 03/07/1985
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/07/1985
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 03/19/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/19/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/19/1985
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 03/19/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 03/19/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/19/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/19/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/19/1985
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/19/1985
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/19/1985
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/19/1985
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 03/19/1985
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/19/1985
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 03/19/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 03/19/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 03/19/1985
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 03/19/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/19/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 03/19/1985
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 03/19/1985
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 03/19/1985
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 03/19/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/19/1985
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 03/19/1985
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 03/19/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/19/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 03/19/1985
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 03/19/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/28/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/28/1985
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 03/28/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/28/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/28/1985
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/28/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 03/28/1985
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 03/28/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 03/28/1985
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 03/28/1985
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/28/1985
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 03/28/1985
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/28/1985
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 03/28/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 03/28/1985
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 03/28/1985
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/28/1985
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 03/28/1985
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/28/1985
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 03/28/1985
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/28/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 03/28/1985
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/28/1985
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 03/28/1985
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/28/1985
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/03/1985
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 04/03/1985
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 04/03/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/03/1985
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 04/03/1985
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/03/1985
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 04/03/1985
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/16/1985
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 04/16/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/16/1985
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/16/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/16/1985
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/16/1985
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 04/16/1985
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 04/16/1985
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 04/16/1985
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 04/22/1985
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 04/22/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 04/22/1985
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 04/22/1985
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/22/1985
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 04/22/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/22/1985
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/22/1985
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/29/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 04/29/1985
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 04/29/1985
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/29/1985
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 04/29/1985
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 05/08/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/08/1985
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/08/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/08/1985
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/08/1985
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/08/1985
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/17/1985
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/17/1985
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 07/10/1985
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/10/1985
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 07/23/1985