Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A joint resolution relating to Central America pursuant to the International Security and Development Cooperation Act of 1985.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
03/20/1986Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: Failed of Passage in House by Yea-Nay Vote: 210 - 222 (Record Vote No: 64).
03/12/1986Reported to House by House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent). Report No: 99-483 (Part IV).
03/11/1986Reported to House by House Committee on Armed Services. Report No: 99-483 (Part III).
03/11/1986Reported to House by House Committee on Foreign Affairs. Report No: 99-483 (Part II).
03/06/1986Reported to House by House Committee on Appropriations. Report No: 99-483 (Part I).
02/27/1986Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date
03/20/1986Failed of Passage in House by Yea-Nay Vote: 210 - 222 (Record Vote No: 64).
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/1986Measure Considered in House as in the Committee of the Whole.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/1986Called up by House by Special Order.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/1986Placed on Union Calendar No: 287.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/1986Reported to House by House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent). Report No: 99-483 (Part IV).
03/11/1986Reported to House by House Committee on Armed Services. Report No: 99-483 (Part III).
03/11/1986Reported to House by House Committee on Foreign Affairs. Report No: 99-483 (Part II).
03/06/1986Ordered to be Reported.
03/06/1986Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/06/1986Ordered to be Reported.
03/06/1986Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/06/1986Reported to House by House Committee on Appropriations. Report No: 99-483 (Part I).
03/06/1986Ordered to be Reported Unfavorably.
03/06/1986Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/05/1986Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs
03/05/1986Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs
03/05/1986Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs
03/05/1986Committee Hearings Held.
03/05/1986Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/04/1986Committee Hearings Held.
03/03/1986Referred to Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/27/1986Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1986Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1986Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1986Referred to House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent).
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1986Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/27/1986

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Intelligence (Permanent)02/27/1986 Referred to
03/04/1986 Hearings by
03/05/1986 Markup by
03/12/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-483 Part 4
House Appropriations02/27/1986 Referred to
03/06/1986 Markup by
03/06/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-483 Part 1
House Armed Services02/27/1986 Referred to
03/05/1986 Hearings by
03/06/1986 Markup by
03/11/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-483 Part 3
House Foreign Affairs02/27/1986 Referred to
03/06/1986 Markup by
03/11/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-483 Part 2
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs03/03/1986 Referred to
03/05/1986 Hearings by
03/05/1986 Markup by
03/05/1986 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.540. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/1986)

Declares that the Congress approves additional assistance for the Nicaraguan democratic resistance that the President requested under the International Security and Development Cooperation Act of 1985.