Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/27/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 02/27/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/06/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 03/06/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/06/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 03/06/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/06/1986
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 03/06/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/06/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 03/06/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/06/1986
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/06/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/06/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/06/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/06/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 03/06/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/06/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 03/06/1986
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 03/06/1986
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 03/06/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/06/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 03/06/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 03/06/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 03/06/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/11/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/11/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 03/11/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/11/1986
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/11/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/11/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/11/1986
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/11/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 03/11/1986
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/11/1986
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 03/11/1986
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 03/11/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 03/11/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 03/11/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 03/13/1986
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/13/1986
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 03/13/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 03/13/1986
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 03/13/1986
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 03/13/1986
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/13/1986
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 03/13/1986
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 03/13/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 03/13/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 03/18/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/18/1986
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/18/1986
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/18/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 03/18/1986
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/18/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/09/1986
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 04/09/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 04/09/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 04/09/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/09/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 04/09/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/09/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/09/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 04/09/1986
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/09/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/09/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/04/1986