Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 03/20/1986
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 04/09/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/09/1986
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/09/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/09/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/09/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 04/09/1986
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 04/09/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 04/09/1986
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 04/09/1986
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/09/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/09/1986
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/09/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 04/09/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/09/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/09/1986
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 04/09/1986
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/09/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/09/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 04/09/1986
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10] 04/09/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/09/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 04/09/1986
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 04/09/1986
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 04/09/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/09/1986
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/09/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/09/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/09/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/09/1986
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/09/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/09/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/09/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 04/09/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/09/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/09/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 04/09/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/09/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 04/09/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/09/1986
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 04/17/1986
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 04/17/1986
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 04/17/1986
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8] 04/17/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/17/1986
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/17/1986
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 04/17/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/17/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/17/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 04/17/1986
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 04/17/1986
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3] 04/17/1986
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 06/05/1986
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/05/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/05/1986
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/05/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/05/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/24/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/24/1986
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3] 07/24/1986