Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A joint resolution to express the sense of Congress on recognition of the contributions of the seven Challenger astronauts by supporting establishment of a Children's Challenge Center for Space Science.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/22/1986Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/22/1986Referred to House Committee on Science and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/22/1986Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2]* 04/22/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 04/22/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/22/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/05/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/05/1986
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/05/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/05/1986
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/05/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/05/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/05/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/05/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 06/05/1986
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/05/1986
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/05/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/05/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 06/05/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/05/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/05/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/05/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/05/1986
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 06/05/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/05/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/05/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 06/05/1986
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 06/05/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/05/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/05/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/05/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/05/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 06/05/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/10/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/10/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/10/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/10/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/10/1986
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 06/10/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/10/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 06/10/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/10/1986
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 06/10/1986
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 06/10/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/10/1986
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/10/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/10/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 06/10/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 06/10/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 06/18/1986
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/18/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 06/18/1986
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/18/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/18/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/18/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/18/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 06/26/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/26/1986
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/21/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 07/21/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 07/21/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 07/21/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 07/21/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/1986

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science and Technology04/22/1986 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.607. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/22/1986)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that a Children's Challenge Center for Space Science should be established in conjunction with the National Aeronautics and Space Administration at the Johnson Space Center as a memorial to the seven Challenger astronauts and others who gave their lives exploring space.