Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2]* 04/22/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 04/22/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/22/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/05/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/05/1986
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/05/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/05/1986
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/05/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/05/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/05/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/05/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 06/05/1986
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/05/1986
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/05/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/05/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 06/05/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/05/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/05/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/05/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/05/1986
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 06/05/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/05/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/05/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 06/05/1986
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 06/05/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/05/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/05/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/05/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/05/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 06/05/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/10/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/10/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/10/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/10/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/10/1986
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 06/10/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/10/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 06/10/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/10/1986
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 06/10/1986
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 06/10/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/10/1986
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/10/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/10/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 06/10/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 06/10/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 06/18/1986
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/18/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 06/18/1986
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/18/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/18/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/18/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/18/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 06/26/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/26/1986
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/21/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 07/21/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 07/21/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 07/21/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 07/21/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/1986