Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 05/08/1986
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 05/08/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 05/08/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 05/08/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 06/24/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/24/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/24/1986
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/24/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/24/1986
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 06/24/1986
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/24/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 06/24/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/24/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/24/1986
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 06/24/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/24/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/24/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 06/24/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/24/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/24/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/24/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/24/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/24/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/24/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 06/24/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/24/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 06/24/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/24/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 06/24/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/24/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 06/24/1986
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 06/24/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 06/24/1986
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 08/01/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 08/01/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 08/01/1986
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 08/01/1986
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 08/01/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/01/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 08/01/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 08/01/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 08/01/1986
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 08/01/1986
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 08/01/1986
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 08/01/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 08/01/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 08/01/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/01/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 08/01/1986
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 08/01/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 08/01/1986
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 08/01/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 08/01/1986
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 08/01/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 08/01/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/01/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 08/01/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 08/01/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 08/01/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 08/08/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/08/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 08/08/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 08/08/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 08/08/1986
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 08/08/1986
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 08/08/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 08/08/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 08/08/1986
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 08/08/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 08/08/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 08/08/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 08/08/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 08/08/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 08/08/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 08/15/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 08/15/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/15/1986
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1] 09/09/1986
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/09/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 09/09/1986
Rep. Waldon, Alton R., Jr. [D-NY-6] 09/09/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 09/19/1986