Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 07/29/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/06/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 08/06/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 08/06/1986
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 08/06/1986
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 08/06/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 08/06/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 08/06/1986
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 08/06/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 08/06/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 08/06/1986
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 08/06/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 08/06/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 08/06/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 08/08/1986
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 08/08/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 08/08/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 08/08/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 08/08/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 08/08/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/08/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 08/08/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 08/08/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 08/08/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 08/15/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/15/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 08/15/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 08/15/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 08/15/1986
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 08/15/1986
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 08/15/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 08/15/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 08/15/1986
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 08/15/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/10/1986
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 09/10/1986
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 09/10/1986
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 09/10/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/10/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/10/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/10/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 09/10/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/10/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/10/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/10/1986
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/10/1986
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/10/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/10/1986
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/10/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 09/10/1986
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 09/10/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/10/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 09/10/1986
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/10/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/10/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 09/10/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 09/10/1986
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/25/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/25/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 09/25/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 09/25/1986
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/25/1986
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 09/25/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 09/25/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 09/25/1986
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 09/25/1986
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/25/1986
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 09/25/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/25/1986
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 09/25/1986
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 09/25/1986
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 09/25/1986
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/25/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 09/25/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 10/02/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 10/02/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 10/02/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/02/1986
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/02/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/02/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/02/1986
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/02/1986
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3] 10/02/1986
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/02/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 10/02/1986
Rep. Eckert, Fred J. [R-NY-30] 10/02/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 10/02/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/02/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 10/02/1986
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 10/02/1986
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 10/02/1986
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 10/02/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/02/1986
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/02/1986
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 10/02/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 10/07/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/07/1986
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 10/07/1986