Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 09/24/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 09/24/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/24/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 10/01/1986
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 10/01/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/01/1986
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 10/01/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 10/01/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 10/01/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/01/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 10/01/1986
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/01/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 10/01/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/01/1986
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 10/01/1986
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/01/1986
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 10/01/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/01/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 10/01/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/01/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 10/01/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 10/01/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 10/01/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/01/1986
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 10/01/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 10/01/1986
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/01/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/01/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 10/01/1986
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/01/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 10/01/1986
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 10/01/1986
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 10/01/1986
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 10/01/1986
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 10/01/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 10/01/1986
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 10/01/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/01/1986
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/01/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 10/01/1986
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 10/02/1986
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/02/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 10/02/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 10/02/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/02/1986
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 10/02/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 10/02/1986
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 10/02/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 10/02/1986
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 10/02/1986
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 10/02/1986
Rep. Waldon, Alton R., Jr. [D-NY-6] 10/02/1986
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 10/02/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/02/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 10/02/1986
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 10/02/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 10/02/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 10/02/1986
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 10/02/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 10/02/1986
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/02/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 10/02/1986
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 10/02/1986
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/02/1986
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 10/02/1986
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/02/1986
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 10/07/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 10/07/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/07/1986
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 10/07/1986
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 10/07/1986
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 10/07/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 10/07/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 10/07/1986
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 10/07/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 10/07/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 10/07/1986
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8] 10/07/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 10/07/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 10/07/1986
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 10/07/1986
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 10/07/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 10/07/1986
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 10/07/1986
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/07/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 10/07/1986
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/07/1986
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 10/07/1986
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 10/07/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/07/1986
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/07/1986
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 10/07/1986
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 10/07/1986
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/07/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/07/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/07/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 10/07/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/07/1986
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 10/07/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/07/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 10/07/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/07/1986
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/07/1986
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 10/07/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/08/1986
Rep. Zschau, Edwin V. W. [R-CA-12] 10/08/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 10/08/1986
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/08/1986
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 10/08/1986
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/09/1986
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 10/10/1986
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 10/10/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/10/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 10/10/1986
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 10/10/1986
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/10/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/10/1986