Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 07/26/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 07/26/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/26/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/26/1985
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/26/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/26/1985
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 07/26/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 07/26/1985
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 10/10/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 10/10/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/10/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 10/10/1985
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 10/10/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 10/10/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/10/1985
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 10/10/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 12/04/1985
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 12/04/1985
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 12/04/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 12/04/1985
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 12/04/1985
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 12/04/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 12/04/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 12/12/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/29/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 01/29/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 01/29/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/03/1986