Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 07/09/1985
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4]* 07/09/1985
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 07/18/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/18/1985
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 07/18/1985
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4] 07/18/1985
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 07/18/1985
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/18/1985
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 07/18/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/18/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/18/1985
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/18/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 07/18/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 07/18/1985
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 07/18/1985
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 07/18/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/18/1985
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 07/18/1985
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/18/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/18/1985
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/18/1985
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/18/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/18/1985
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 07/18/1985
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 07/18/1985
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/18/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 07/30/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/30/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 07/30/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/30/1985
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 07/30/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 08/01/1985
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 08/01/1985
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 09/11/1985
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 09/11/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 09/11/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/29/1985
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/06/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 11/06/1985
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 11/21/1985
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 11/21/1985
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 11/21/1985