Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 02/21/1985
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 02/21/1985
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 04/02/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 04/02/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/02/1985
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/02/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/02/1985
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 04/02/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 04/02/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/02/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/02/1985
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 04/02/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 04/02/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 05/06/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/06/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 05/06/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/06/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 06/06/1985
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 06/06/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/06/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/06/1985
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/27/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/27/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 06/27/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/27/1985
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/27/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/27/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/27/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 06/27/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 06/27/1985
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 06/27/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/25/1985
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/13/1986
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/13/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/13/1986
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/13/1986