Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 03/20/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 03/20/1986
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/21/1986
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/21/1986
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 03/21/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 04/09/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 04/09/1986
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/09/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/09/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/16/1986
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 04/16/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 04/16/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 04/16/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/16/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/16/1986
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 04/16/1986
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/16/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 04/16/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/16/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/16/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/16/1986
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 04/16/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 04/16/1986
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/16/1986
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 04/16/1986
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/16/1986
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 04/16/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/16/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 04/16/1986
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/16/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/16/1986
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/16/1986
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 04/16/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 04/17/1986
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 04/17/1986
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 04/17/1986
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/17/1986
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/17/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/17/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/17/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/17/1986
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 04/17/1986
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/22/1986
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 04/22/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/24/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/24/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 04/24/1986
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 04/24/1986
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/06/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 05/06/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/06/1986
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 05/06/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/06/1986
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 05/06/1986
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 05/06/1986
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/06/1986
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1] 05/06/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/06/1986
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 05/06/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/06/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/06/1986
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 05/06/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 05/06/1986
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 05/08/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/14/1986
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 06/10/1986
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/10/1986
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 06/10/1986
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/10/1986
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/10/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/10/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 06/10/1986
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/10/1986
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/10/1986
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/10/1986
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 06/10/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/10/1986
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 06/10/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 06/10/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/10/1986
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 06/10/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 06/10/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/10/1986
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 06/10/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/10/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 06/10/1986
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/10/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 06/10/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/10/1986
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 06/10/1986
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 06/10/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 06/10/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/10/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 06/10/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/10/1986
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 06/10/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 06/10/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 06/10/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/10/1986
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 06/10/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/10/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 06/10/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/10/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/10/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/10/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/11/1986
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 06/17/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/17/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/17/1986
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 06/17/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/17/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/17/1986
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/17/1986
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/17/1986
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/17/1986
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3] 06/24/1986
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 07/16/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 07/16/1986
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/16/1986
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/16/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 07/22/1986
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 07/23/1986
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/24/1986
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 08/12/1986