Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 04/16/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 04/16/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/16/1986
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 04/23/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 04/23/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 04/23/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 04/23/1986
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/23/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/23/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 04/23/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/23/1986
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 04/23/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/23/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 04/23/1986
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 04/23/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/23/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/23/1986
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/23/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/23/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/23/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/23/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/23/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/23/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 04/23/1986
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/23/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/23/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 04/23/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/23/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 04/30/1986
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 04/30/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 04/30/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 04/30/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 04/30/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 04/30/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/30/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/30/1986
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/20/1986
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 05/20/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/20/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/20/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 06/04/1986
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 06/04/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 06/04/1986
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/04/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/04/1986
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/26/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 06/26/1986
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 07/15/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 08/07/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 08/15/1986