Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 06/11/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/18/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/18/1986
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 06/18/1986
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 06/18/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 06/18/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 06/18/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/18/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 06/18/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 06/18/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/18/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 06/18/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/18/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 06/18/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/23/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 06/23/1986
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/23/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/23/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/23/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 06/23/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/23/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/23/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/23/1986
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/23/1986
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 06/23/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/23/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/16/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/16/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 07/16/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/16/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/16/1986
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 07/16/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/16/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 07/16/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 07/16/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/16/1986
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 07/16/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/16/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/16/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/16/1986
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 07/16/1986
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 07/16/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/16/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/16/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/30/1986
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/30/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 07/30/1986
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/30/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 08/13/1986
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 08/13/1986
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/10/1986