Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Rulemaking Procedures Reform Act of 1985

Short Titles as Introduced

Rulemaking Procedures Reform Act of 1985

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase the accountability of, policy coordination by, and management of priorities by agencies through an improved mechanism for congressional oversight of the rules of agencies.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/14/1986Senate Committee on Rules discharged. Pursuant to the order of September 24, 1986.
09/26/1986Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment. With written report No. 99-492. Minority views filed.
05/15/1985Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date
10/14/1986Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1099.
Action By: Senate
10/14/1986Senate Committee on Rules discharged. Pursuant to the order of September 24, 1986.
Action By: Senate
09/26/1986Referred to the Committee on Rules pursuant to the order of September 24, 1986.
Action By: Senate
09/26/1986Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment. With written report No. 99-492. Minority views filed.
09/24/1986Ordered, that when reported from Judiciary, the bill be referred to Committee on Rules & Administration for a period of fifteen calendar days for the consideration of Sec. 3.
Action By: Senate
07/17/1986Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
11/07/1985Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Practice and Procedure
07/09/1985Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 99-265.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Practice and Procedure
06/18/1985Committee on Judiciary requested executive comment from Justice Department.
06/18/1985Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/15/1985Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/15/1985 Referred to
07/17/1986 Markup by
09/26/1986 Reported by S.Rept 99-492
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Practice and Procedure06/18/1985 Referred to
07/09/1985 Hearings by
11/07/1985 Markup by
11/07/1985 Reported by
Senate Rules and Administration09/26/1986 Referred to
10/14/1986 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.1145.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1145. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (09/26/1986)

(Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 99-492)

Rulemaking Procedures Reform Act of 1985 - Revises the definition of "rule" under the Administrative Procedure Act. Declares that such term does not include agency statements involving a matter relating to public property or contracts or general statements of policy of the Tennessee Valley authority except where statutorily required.

Makes provisions for a Federal agency to promulgate an emergency rule, which shall terminate 120 days after its effective date. Requires agencies, after general notice in the Federal Register, to give interested parties not less than 60 days to participate in any rulemaking, except those for emergency rules.

Requires an agency to transmit to the appropriate congressional committees an agenda listing all areas in which the agency intends to propose rules during the next 12-month period.

Requires an agency, on the day it forwards a recommended final rule to the Federal Register, to transmit a copy to the Secretary of the Senate and the Clerk of the House of Representatives for referral to the appropriate congressional committee.

Subjects recommended final rules to the congressional veto procedure. Prohibits major rules from taking effect before 90 days, and nonmajor rules before 45 days, after submission to the Congress. Allows recommended final rules to become effective after the day on which either House of Congress rejects a joint resolution of disapproval. Requires the resubmission to the next Congress of any recommended final rule which is subject to the veto procedure at the time the current Congress adjourns sine die.

Allows an agency to issue a recommended final rule which relates to the same acts or practices as a rule which did not become effective. Sets forth general requirements for such an amended rule.

Declares that congressional inaction or rejection of a joint resolution of disapproval with respect to a recommended final rule shall not be deemed an expression of approval of such rule.

Sets forth procedures for consideration of such joint resolutions of disapproval.

Makes it out of order in the House or Senate to vote on final passage of any bill or resolution making appropriations for an agency which has issued a rule that the Congress has disapproved, unless such bill or resolution prohibits the use of appropriations to carry out such rule.