Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/23/1985
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 06/03/1985
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 06/03/1985
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 06/13/1985
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/17/1985
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 10/03/1985
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 12/12/1985