Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 05/22/1985
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 05/23/1985
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 05/24/1985
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/24/1985
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 06/26/1985
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 07/08/1985
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 09/30/1985
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 11/06/1985
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 11/20/1985
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/20/1985
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 12/02/1985
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 12/02/1985
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 12/05/1985