Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 01/24/1985
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL]* 01/24/1985
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 01/24/1985
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 01/24/1985
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 01/24/1985
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 01/24/1985
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 02/06/1985
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/06/1985
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 02/20/1985
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 02/20/1985
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/26/1985
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 02/26/1985
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/24/1985
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 05/07/1985
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/24/1985
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 06/27/1985
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/27/1985
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/27/1985
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/27/1985
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/09/1985