Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL]* 07/16/1985
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL]* 07/16/1985
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 07/16/1985
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 07/16/1985
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 07/16/1985
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/16/1985
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 07/16/1985
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/16/1985
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 07/22/1985
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/22/1985
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV] 07/22/1985
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/22/1985
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/30/1985
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 07/30/1985
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/07/1985
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 10/10/1985
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD] 10/17/1985
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 10/29/1985
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 12/11/1985
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 12/18/1985