Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 17, United States Code, to clarify the definition of the local service area of a primary transmitter in the case of a low power television station.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/1985Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
09/16/1985Committee on Judiciary received executive comment from Federal Communications Commission.
08/20/1985Committee on Judiciary requested executive comment from Justice Department, Federal Communications Commission.
08/20/1985Referred to Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/30/1985Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV]* 10/23/1985
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV] 12/12/1985

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary07/30/1985 Referred to
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks08/20/1985 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1526. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/30/1985)

Amends the copyright law to redefine local service area of a primary transmitter in the case of a low power television station for secondary transmission purposes.