Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 08/01/1985
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 08/01/1985
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/26/1985
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/11/1985
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 12/18/1985
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/26/1986
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/03/1986
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 03/04/1986
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 03/05/1986
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/12/1986
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/05/1986
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/24/1986
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/24/1986

Show cosponsors who withdrew