Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Gold Bullion Coin Act of 1985

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Gold Bullion Coin Act of 1985

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Gold Bullion Coin Act of 1985

Short Titles as Introduced

Gold Bullion Coin Act of 1985

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the minting of gold bullion coins.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/17/1985Became Public Law No: 99-185.
12/17/1985Signed by President.
12/05/1985Presented to President.
12/02/1985Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
11/14/1985Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/13/1985Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Garn with an amendment. Without written report.
09/12/1985Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/17/1985Became Public Law No: 99-185.
12/17/1985Signed by President.
12/05/1985SenatePresented to President.
12/05/1985SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
12/02/1985HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
12/02/1985HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
11/20/1985HouseUnanimous Consent Request to Consider Measure Rejected in House.
11/14/1985SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/13/1985SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
11/13/1985SenateCommittee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Garn with an amendment. Without written report.
11/13/1985SenateCommittee on Banking. Approved for reporting with an amendment favorably.
10/09/1985SenateCommittee on Banking. Approved for reporting an original bill (S. 1752) in lieu of this measure.
09/12/1985SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs09/12/1985 Referred to
11/13/1985 Markup by
11/13/1985 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1639. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/14/1985)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Gold Bullion Coin Act of 1985 - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue gold coins in 50-dollar, 25-dollar, ten-dollar, and five-dollar denominations. Requires the Secretary to acquire the gold for such coins by purchase of gold mined from natural deposits in the United States or a U.S. territory or possession within one year after the month the ore was mined. Prohibits the Secretary from paying more than the average world price for such gold. Allows the Secretary to use gold from U.S. reserves in the absence of available supplies of such mined gold at the average world price.

Repeals a provision prohibiting the Government from delivering any gold coin.

Requires any profit from the sale of such coins to be deposited in the Treasury and applied toward reducing the national debt. Directs the Secretary to ensure that the issuance of such coins results in no net cost to the Government.